IL HB5289 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-20 - Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Creates the Public Library Support Fund. Provides that, within 30 days after the first day of each State fiscal year, the State Comptroller and State Treasurer shall transfer from the General Revenue Fund to the Public Library Support Fund an amount equal $20,000 multiplied by the number of residents of each public library district in the State in which at least 60% of the residents report a household income at or below the federal poverty level. Provides that the Secretary of State shall use moneys in the Public Library Support Fund to make grants to those public library districts. Provides that no public library district may receive more than $20,000 per resident of that public library district from the Fund in any State fiscal year. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-LIBRARY SUPPORT
Sponsors
Rep. William Davis [D] | Rep. Lisa Dugan [D] | Rep. Al Riley [D] | Rep. Robert Rita [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 100 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-04-20 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-20 | First Reading | |
2010-04-15 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jeffrey M. Schoenberg | |
2010-03-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 24, 2010 | |
2010-03-23 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-03-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita | |
2010-03-23 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lisa M. Dugan | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 100-015-000 | |
2010-03-22 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley | |
2010-03-22 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-22 | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-22 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-03-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-17 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis | |
2010-03-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-03-10 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-005-000 | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2010-03-10 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-02-16 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |