IL HB5288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Alcoholism and Other Drug Abuse and Dependency Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to develop and maintain an online registry for recovery residences that operate in Illinois to serve as a referral resource for individuals seeking continued recovery assistance. Defines "recovery residence" to mean a sober, safe, and healthy living environment that promotes recovery from alcohol and other drug use and associated problems. Encourages non-licensable recovery residences to register with the Department. Provides that the registry shall be publicly available through online posting and shall highlight attributes of the recovery residences and their locations. Provides that registrants are encouraged to seek national accreditation from any entity that has developed uniform national standards for recovery residences. Effective January 1, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-RECOVERY RESIDENCES

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-000
2018-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Human Services Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Bivins
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Human Services; 010-000-000
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-26SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-26SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Tim Bivins
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 010-000-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030155-35New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback