IL HB5287 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Requires every person applying for benefits under the federal Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program to, at the time of application or subsequent redetermination of eligibility, submit to the Department of Human Services documentation demonstrating that the person is enrolled in an adult education program as defined in the Adult Education Act or in an educational program that is expected to result in the receipt of a high school equivalence certificate. Exempts certain persons from the requirement. Provides that the Department shall apply for any federal waiver, if required, to implement the requirement.
Title
SNAP-ADULT EDUCATION REQUIRE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5287&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5287.htm |