IL HB5282 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. In provisions concerning the Teen Responsibility, Education, Achievement, Caring, and Hope (Teen REACH) Grant Program, provides that notwithstanding any other law or rule, the Department of Human Services shall permit all grantees under the Teen REACH Grant Program to utilize an alternate data collection system, other than the management information system provided by the Department, if the alternate data collection system can provide the Department with the data and reporting information it requires in a timely manner.
Title
DHS-TEEN REACH-DATA COLLECTION
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Halpin [D] | Rep. Suzanne Ness [D] | Rep. Barbara Hernandez [D] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] |
Rep. Michael Marron [R] | Rep. Rita Mayfield [D] | Rep. Dan Brady [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2022-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael T. Marron |
2022-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2022-02-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael Halpin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 10-47 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5282&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5282.htm |