IL HB5281 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Medical Assistance Article of the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that subject to federal approval, on and after January 1, 2025, the reimbursement rates for nursing paid through Nursing and Personal Care Services for non-waiver customers and to providers of private duty nursing services for medically fragile and technology dependent children eligible for medical assistance shall be 7% higher than the reimbursement rates in effect for nursing services on December 31, 2024. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHFS-MEDICALLY FRAGILE KIDS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2024-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
30555-2bAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback