IL HB5281 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-22 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall issue distinctive registration plates for non-highway vehicles. Provides that the Secretary shall issue these plates only to non-highway vehicles that are insured and have brakes, a steering apparatus, tires, a rearview mirror, red reflectorized warning devices in the front and rear, a slow moving emblem on the rear, a headlight that emits a white light, a tail lamp that emits a red light, brake lights, and turn signals. Provides that every owner of a non-highway vehicle that drives upon a roadway with a posted speed limit of 35 miles per hour or less shall pay the Secretary an annual registration fee of $76. Provides that the registration fee shall be distributed as follows: $1 to the State Treasurer, for deposit into the State Police Service Fund; $30 to the State Treasurer, for deposit into the Road Fund; and $45 to the Treasurer of the county of residence of the owner of the non-highway vehicle, for deposit into the road fund of the county. Provides that vehicles with a registration plate may be operated on any street, highway, or roadway where the posted speed limit is 35 miles per hour or less or any county highway where the posted speed limit is 55 miles per hour or less and may make a direct crossing upon or across certain roads.
Title
LICENSE PLATES NON-HWY VEH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Remains in Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 005-008-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1426.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-412 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
625 | 5 | 3-806.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5281&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB5281.htm |