IL HB5276 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-06 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that any child advocacy center, accredited by the National Children's Alliance, or any employee thereof acting in good faith and exercising due care shall have immunity from any civil liability that may be incurred or imposed through participation in any investigation process required under the Act or any judicial proceeding resulting from the investigation process.
Title
ANCRA-CHILD ADVOCACY CENTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-02-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
325 | 5 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5276&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5276.htm |