IL HB5272 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Environmental Protection Act. Requires the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, with the assistance of the Department of Transportation, to conduct a study describing the environmental and human health impacts caused by runways and air traffic at Chicago O'Hare International Airport. Requires the Agency, when conducting this study, to pay particular attention to the impact of air pollution, noise pollution, the emission of gases and fluids by aircraft, and similar factors on the quality of life, health, and property values of persons who live adjacent to the flight paths used by Chicago O'Hare International Airport. Requires the Agency, with the Department's assistance, to monitor noise levels experienced in 2019 and 2020. Requires the Department to assist with the study. Requires the Agency to deliver a written report of its findings to the General Assembly by no later than October 31, 2020. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AIRPORTS-ENVIRONMENTAL IMPACT

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-16HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-16HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christine Winger

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2027052705-380New CodeSee Bill Text
41554Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback