IL HB5268 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Defines "member-based organization" as any group, association, or organization that: (1) has a membership that includes one or more government taxing bodies; (2) lobbies on behalf of its governmental members; and (3) receives a majority of its funding from its governmental members. Provides that a member-based organization is a public body under the Act; however, only records relating to the member-based organization's receipt of public funds or its expenditures made in whole or in part with public funds are public records subject to inspection and copying by the public.
Title
FOIA-GOVERNMENT ASSOCIATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5268&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5268.htm |