IL HB5267 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Crime Victims Compensation Act. Provides that "crime of violence" includes: (i) posting identifying or graphic information on a pornographic Internet site or possessing graphic information with pornographic material; and (ii) non-consensual dissemination of private sexual images. Specifies that "pecuniary loss" means appropriate expenses (instead of expenses) for psychiatric care or counseling. Provides that a law enforcement agency within this State shall, within 15 days of receipt of a written request, provide the Attorney General's office with the law enforcement agency's full written report of the investigation of the crime for which an application for compensation has been filed. Provides that the law enforcement agency shall not redact any information from the report. Provides that within 15 days of receipt of the request, a law enforcement agency shall respond to a written request from the Attorney General's office for additional information necessary to assist the Bureau in making a recommendation for compensation. Provides that records that are obtained by the Attorney General's office shall not be disclosed to the public, including the applicant, by the Attorney General's office. Provides that the records, while in the possession of the Attorney General's office, are exempt from disclosure under the Freedom of Information Act. Makes a corresponding change in the Freedom of Information Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VICTIMS COMPENSATION-RECORDS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 011-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-000-000
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text
740452Amended CodeCitation Text
740454.2New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback