IL HB5263 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Commemorative Dates Act. Provides that the Governor shall annually designate by official proclamation the day before (currently, after) Gold Star Mothers' Day as Gold Star Family Day to be observed throughout the State as a day to honor and commemorate the families of men and women who gave their lives while serving with the armed forces of the United States in time of war or during a period of hostilities. Effective immediately.
Title
GOLD STAR FAMILY DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Veterans' Affairs Committee; 008-000-000 |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 490 | 50 | Amended Code | Citation Text |