IL HB5262 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Infrastructure Delivery and Program Transparency Act. Provides for the creation of an Infrastructure Implementation Coordinator within the Office of the Secretary of Transportation to administer the Rebuild Illinois Program. Provides that the Office of the Secretary of Transportation shall develop a publicly available project information website that includes detailed information about each infrastructure project. Provides that the Coordinator shall track and make publicly available a master program, budget, and construction schedule and program metrics. Provides that after a review of the program metrics, the Coordinator shall implement improvements to the Rebuild Illinois Program in accordance with the established overall program budget and project schedule. Provides that the Department of Transportation and the Coordinator shall implement certain initiatives to assist the Department with meeting program goals.
Title
INFRASTRUCTURE TRANSPARENCY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-03-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-03-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-002-000 |
2022-03-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-10 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Seth Lewis |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeff Keicher |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2022-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Suzanne Ness |
2022-03-01 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-01 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |