IL HB5257 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall provide a minor's guardian ad litem or a minor's attorney appointed under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987, with a copy of each significant event report, as defined by Department rule, involving the minor no later than 3 days after the Department learns of an event requiring a significant event report to be written, or earlier as required by Department rule. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a guardian ad litem appointed or attorney appointed under the Act, shall receive a copy of each significant event report, as defined by Department of Children and Family Services rule, that involves the minor no later than 3 days after the Department learns of an event requiring a significant event report to be written, or earlier as required by Department rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JUV COURT-SIGNIFICANT EVENTS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-03HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0689
2018-08-03HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-03HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 049-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Human Services
2018-04-25SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-19HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-19HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-03-07HouseTo Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee
2018-03-07HouseRemains in Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-07HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-02-26HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050535.1Amended CodeCitation Text
7054052-17Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback