IL HB5257 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0689
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that the Department of Children and Family Services shall provide a minor's guardian ad litem or a minor's attorney appointed under the Juvenile Court Act of 1987, with a copy of each significant event report, as defined by Department rule, involving the minor no later than 3 days after the Department learns of an event requiring a significant event report to be written, or earlier as required by Department rule. Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that a guardian ad litem appointed or attorney appointed under the Act, shall receive a copy of each significant event report, as defined by Department of Children and Family Services rule, that involves the minor no later than 3 days after the Department learns of an event requiring a significant event report to be written, or earlier as required by Department rule.
Title
JUV COURT-SIGNIFICANT EVENTS
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Gregory Harris [D] | Rep. Emanuel Welch [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Sen. Julie Morrison [D] | Sen. Chris Nybo [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0689 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Chris Nybo |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee; |
2018-04-10 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 003-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-03-07 | House | To Domestic Relations Law Subcommittee |
2018-03-07 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-01 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 35.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 2-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |