IL HB5254 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-01 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to increase rates by 7% to purchase services from other agencies that provide professional child welfare services, including intact family services, substitute care services, residential treatment services, transitional living services, and independent living services. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to allow the Department of Children and Family Services to adopt emergency rules for specified purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DCFS-RATE INCREASE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-01HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseFinal Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018
2018-04-23HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-05HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2050545New CodeSee Bill Text
51005-45Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback