IL HB5254 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to increase rates by 7% to purchase services from other agencies that provide professional child welfare services, including intact family services, substitute care services, residential treatment services, transitional living services, and independent living services. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act to allow the Department of Children and Family Services to adopt emergency rules for specified purposes.
Title
DCFS-RATE INCREASE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-01 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 1, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 505 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 100 | 5-45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5254&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5254.htm |