IL HB5253 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Modifies the provisions requiring State agencies to issue an economic impact analysis when proposing new rules or amendments to rules that affect small businesses. Provides, among other requirements, that the economic impact analysis shall include: (1) a list of the industries that will have to comply with the proposed rule or amendment; (2) a statement of the impact on small businesses having less than 100 employees, and comparing specified cost factors; and (3) a description of the actions taken by the State agency to mitigate the costs to small businesses created by the proposed rule or amendment, and a description of the involvement of small business advocates in the development of the proposed rule or amendment. Provides that when any rule or amendment to an existing rule is proposed for which a small business economic impact analysis is required, the adopting State agency must provide notice to affected small businesses of the proposed rule through specified means. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SMALL BUS-ECON IMPACT ANALYSIS

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Commerce and Economic Development
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-04-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51005-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback