IL HB5253 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-10)
Status: Passed on August 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-03 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0688
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Modifies the provisions requiring State agencies to issue an economic impact analysis when proposing new rules or amendments to rules that affect small businesses. Provides, among other requirements, that the economic impact analysis shall include: (1) a list of the industries that will have to comply with the proposed rule or amendment; (2) a statement of the impact on small businesses having less than 100 employees, and comparing specified cost factors; and (3) a description of the actions taken by the State agency to mitigate the costs to small businesses created by the proposed rule or amendment, and a description of the involvement of small business advocates in the development of the proposed rule or amendment. Provides that when any rule or amendment to an existing rule is proposed for which a small business economic impact analysis is required, the adopting State agency must provide notice to affected small businesses of the proposed rule through specified means. Makes conforming changes.
Title
SMALL BUS-ECON IMPACT ANALYSIS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-03 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0688 |
2018-08-03 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-03 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-21 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce and Economic Development; 009-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce and Economic Development |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-000-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 100 | 5-30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |