IL HB5251 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the of the Illinois Insurance Code. Merges the Health Maintenance Organization Guaranty Association Article of the Health Maintenance Organization Act into the Illinois Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Law. Makes conforming changes. Provides that the rights, powers, privileges, assets, property, duties, debts, obligations, and liabilities of each association prior to merger shall remain with the members of the respective association. Provides the rights, powers, privileges, assets, property, debts, obligations, and liabilities of each association after the merger. Repeals the Health Maintenance Organization Guaranty Association Article of the Health Maintenance Organization Act. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS CD-LIFE HEALTH GUARANTY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 014-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance: Health & Life Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine
2018-03-07HouseAssigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-23HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Laura Fine

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
215125Art. VIRepealed CodeCitation Text
2155531.02Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.03Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.05Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.06Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.07Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.08Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.09Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.11Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.12Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.13Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.14Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.19Amended CodeCitation Text
2155531.20New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback