IL HB5248 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, beginning on January 1, 2019 or as soon thereafter as is practical, to offer a special instant scratch-off game for the benefit of research pertaining to autism. Requires the net revenue from that game to be deposited into the Autism Research Checkoff Fund. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Includes moneys from the special instant scratch-off game to be deposited in the Autism Research Checkoff Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-AUTISM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-08 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2018-02-27 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 10-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 21.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5248&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5248.htm |