IL HB5247 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0992
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, no later than 6 months after the effective date of the amendatory Act, the State Board of Education shall adopt rules as may be necessary to allow students of any high school in this State who are 16 years of age or older to participate in registered apprenticeship programs; defines "registered apprenticeship program". Provides that the rules shall include the waiver of all non-academic requirements mandated for graduation from a high school under the Code that would otherwise prohibit or prevent a student from participating in a registered apprenticeship program. Makes related changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-REG APPRENTICE PROGRAM

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-20HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0992
2018-08-20HouseEffective Date August 20, 2018
2018-08-20HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 109-000-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-21HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-21HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-21HouseArrived in House
2018-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 048-000-000
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Weaver
2018-05-18SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-16SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Education; 008-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-08SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2018
2018-05-01SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chuck Weaver
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2018-04-19HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-17HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 018-000-000
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-11HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10552-3.173New CodeSee Bill Text
105527-22.05Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5247&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5247.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5247eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5247enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/100/100-0992.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5247ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5247ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5247sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5247_04192018_013000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5247_05212018_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5247sam001_05312018_080000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback