IL HB5243 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Independent Tax Tribunal Act of 2012. Expands the jurisdiction of the Tribunal to include the County Motor Fuel Tax Law, the Live Adult Entertainment Facility Surcharge Act, the Vehicle Use Tax, the Metropolitan Pier and Exposition Authority Food and Beverage Tax, the Tire User Fee, the Chicago Soft Drink Tax, the Drycleaning Solvent Tax, the Energy Assistance Act of 1989, the Qualified Solid Waste Fee, the Illinois Hydraulic Fracturing Tax Act, or the Medical Cannabis Cultivation Privilege Tax Law. Provides for additional procedures, including automatic remand. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TAX TRIBUNAL-JURISDICTION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseTo Sales and Other Taxes Subcommittee
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3510101-45Amended CodeCitation Text
3510101-50Amended CodeCitation Text
3510101-51New CodeSee Bill Text
3510101-55Amended CodeCitation Text
3510101-63Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback