IL HB5241 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Adds the following Chapters to the list of portions of the Code governed by the Section concerning the disposition of fines and forfeitures: Certificates of Title and Registration of Vehicles; Anti-Theft Laws and Abandoned Vehicles; Dealers, Transporters, Wreckers and Rebuilders; the Illinois Driver Licensing Law; the Illinois Safety and Family Financial Responsibility Law; Motor Vehicles Used for Transportation of Passengers; Owners of For Rent Vehicles For-Hire; Civil Liability; the Illinois Highway Safety Law; the Illinois Commercial Relocation of Trespassing Vehicles Law; Motor Carrier Safety Regulations; and the Illinois Commercial Transportation Law.
Title
VEH CD-DISPOSITION OF FINES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 008-000-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 16-105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |