IL HB5240 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $4,000,000 from the General Revenue Fund to the Department of Children and Family Services for grants to assist the Illinois Association of Court Appointed Special Advocates in its efforts to advocate for timely placement of children in permanent, safe, stable homes. Effective July 1, 2020.
Title
$DCFS-CT OF SPECIAL ADVOCATES
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Jonathan Pizer [D] | Sen. Terri Bryant [R] |
Rep. David Welter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-03-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5240&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/PDF/10100HB5240.pdf |