IL HB5231 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Law Enforcement Support Program Confidentiality Act. Provides that information, omissions, confessions, or other communication obtained by a participant in a peer support program involving a peer support counselor from a law enforcement officer, public safety employee, peace officer, firefighter, or emergency services personnel shall be considered confidential information and shall not be released to any person or entity, including, but not limited to, a court, administrative agency or tribunal, or public officer or employer, unless: (1) to the extent it appears necessary to prevent the commission of an act that is likely to result in a clear imminent risk of serious physical injury or death of a person or persons; (2) when required by court order; or (3) when, after full disclosure has been provided, the person who made the confession, admission, or other communication has given specific written consent. Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Provides that a provision permitting the Department of State Police to deny an application for or to revoke and seize a Firearm Owner's Identification Card of a person who has been a patient of a mental health facility within the past 5 years is not applicable to an active law enforcement officer employed by a unit of government, unless the Department receives an affirmative statement by a treating clinical psychologist or physician that the law enforcement officer is a threat to himself or herself, another person, or the public. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ENFORCEMENT CONFIDENTIALITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 28, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-25SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 009-000-000
2018-05-25SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-24SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-24SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-21SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-05-21SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John F. Curran
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-26HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-18HouseMotion Withdrawn Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-12HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee;
2018-04-12HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-12HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2018-04-12HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseMotion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-09HouseTo Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-04-06HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-03-05HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430658Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback