IL HB5229 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Program Act. Provides that the Act applies to employers with at least one employee, rather than fewer than 25 employees. Provides for automatic increases in contributions. Makes changes regarding penalties for employers who fail, without reasonable cause, to enroll an employee in the Program. Provides that, for purposes of the penalties, the Department of Revenue shall determine total employee count for employers using the annual average from employer-reported quarterly data. Provides that the Department may provide notice regarding penalties in an electronic format to be determined by the Department. Provides that penalty provisions shall become operative by January 1, 2021, rather than 9 months after the Illinois Secure Choice Savings Board notifies the Director of Revenue that the Program has been implemented.
Title
SECURE CHOICE SAVINGS PROGRAM
Sponsors
Rep. Will Guzzardi [D] | Rep. Katie Stuart [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
Rep. Sam Yingling [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2020-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Will Guzzardi |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 80 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 80 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5229&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB5229.htm |