IL HB5221 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Public Employee Disability Act. Provides that the term "eligible employee" as used in the Act includes firefighters employed as full-time paramedics or firefighters who perform paramedic duties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISABILITY BENEFIT-FIREFIGHTER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 101 N: 8 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-002-000
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 011-003-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-05-01SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 101-008-000
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 023-003-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
53451Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback