IL HB5212 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Occupational Therapy Practice Act and the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may issue an occupational therapist, occupational therapy assistant, physical therapist, or physical therapist assistant license to an applicant who is licensed under another jurisdiction upon filing an application, paying the required fee, and meeting requirements established by rule (rather than if the requirements for licensure in that jurisdiction were, at the date of licensure, substantially equivalent to the requirements in force in this State on that date or equivalent to the requirements of this Act). Provides that an applicant for endorsement shall meet the requirements for endorsement upon filing the application, paying the required fee, and showing proof of licensure in another jurisdiction for at least 10 consecutive years without discipline by certified verification of licensure by the jurisdiction. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PHYSICAL THERAPY-ENDORSEMENT

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-02HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2018-05-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-05-30HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2018-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 053-002-000
2018-05-18SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018
2018-05-18SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000
2018-05-16SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-10SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-09SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-05-09SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-25SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-25HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2018-04-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2018-04-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-001-000
2018-04-10HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2257513Amended CodeCitation Text
2259011Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback