IL HB5212 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Occupational Therapy Practice Act and the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may issue an occupational therapist, occupational therapy assistant, physical therapist, or physical therapist assistant license to an applicant who is licensed under another jurisdiction upon filing an application, paying the required fee, and meeting requirements established by rule (rather than if the requirements for licensure in that jurisdiction were, at the date of licensure, substantially equivalent to the requirements in force in this State on that date or equivalent to the requirements of this Act). Provides that an applicant for endorsement shall meet the requirements for endorsement upon filing the application, paying the required fee, and showing proof of licensure in another jurisdiction for at least 10 consecutive years without discipline by certified verification of licensure by the jurisdiction. Effective immediately.
Title
PHYSICAL THERAPY-ENDORSEMENT
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Demmer [R] | Rep. Kelly Burke [D] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Michael McAuliffe [R] |
Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. David Welter [R] | Sen. Bill Brady [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-09-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. William E. Brady |
2018-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-30 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-05-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-002-000 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2018 |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 012-001-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tom Demmer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 75 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 90 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |