IL HB5206 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on December 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1484
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Authorizes county clerks to use an electronic system for reporting deaths, when established as provided in the Vital Records Act, to purge voter registration records of the names of deceased voters (now, requires county clerks to purge voter registration records by using death-related records). Requires that persons in charge of vital records provide municipal boards of election commissioners with the names and previous addresses of persons over the age of 18 (now, 21) years who died in the past month.
Title
ELECTIONS-DECEASED VOTERS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-12-02 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-11-16 - House - Motion in House (Y: 106 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-03 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-10 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1484 | |
2010-12-10 | Effective Date January 1, 2011 | |
2010-12-02 | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses | |
2010-12-02 | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 050-000-000 | |
2010-12-02 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-30 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2010-11-23 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 30, 2010 | |
2010-11-16 | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 106-007-000 | |
2010-11-16 | 3/5 Vote Required | |
2010-11-10 | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Dan Brady | |
2010-11-10 | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 16, 2010 | |
2010-07-27 | Governor Amendatory Veto | |
2010-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-05-03 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-05-03 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Dan Brady | |
2010-04-30 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 | |
2010-04-30 | Arrived in House | |
2010-04-29 | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 | |
2010-04-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2010 | |
2010-04-27 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-14 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2010 | |
2010-04-14 | Do Pass as Amended Elections; 006-000-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted | |
2010-04-13 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Elections | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2010-04-06 | Assigned to Elections | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-09 | First Reading | |
2010-03-09 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 3, 2010 | |
2010-03-02 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Renée Kosel | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jil Tracy | |
2010-02-25 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kay Hatcher | |
2010-02-25 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly | |
2010-02-25 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 | |
2010-02-23 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-23 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-16 | Do Pass / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 007-000-000 | |
2010-02-09 | Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-02-03 | First Reading | |
2010-02-03 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |