IL HB5203 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Department of State Police, for State Police officers, and the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board, for local law enforcement officers, shall adopt rules to require law enforcement officers to receive victim sensitivity training concerning the investigation of incidents of sexual assault and sexual abuse, including the interviewing of victims, when the victim of the sexual assault or sexual abuse is under 13 years of age for all probationary, full-time, and part-time law enforcement officers. Provides that the training shall be at least 40 hours and the officer shall receive and successfully complete the training every 5 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE-VICTIM SENSITIVITY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-27HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K Smith

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-98Amended CodeCitation Text
5070510.21Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback