IL HB5203 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0910
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Department of State Police, for State Police officers, and the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board, for local law enforcement officers, shall adopt rules to require law enforcement officers to receive victim sensitivity training concerning the investigation of incidents of sexual assault and sexual abuse, including the interviewing of victims, when the victim of the sexual assault or sexual abuse is under 13 years of age for all probationary, full-time, and part-time law enforcement officers. Provides that the training shall be at least 40 hours and the officer shall receive and successfully complete the training every 5 years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

POLICE-VICTIM SENSITIVITY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-17HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0910
2018-08-17HouseEffective Date January 1, 2019
2018-08-17HouseGovernor Approved
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 051-000-000
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-03HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-27HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K Smith

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2026052605-98Amended CodeCitation Text
5070510.21Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback