IL HB5203 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0910
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-17 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0910
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of State Police Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the Illinois Police Training Act. Provides that the Department of State Police, for State Police officers, and the Illinois Law Enforcement Training Standards Board, for local law enforcement officers, shall adopt rules to require law enforcement officers to receive victim sensitivity training concerning the investigation of incidents of sexual assault and sexual abuse, including the interviewing of victims, when the victim of the sexual assault or sexual abuse is under 13 years of age for all probationary, full-time, and part-time law enforcement officers. Provides that the training shall be at least 40 hours and the officer shall receive and successfully complete the training every 5 years.
Title
POLICE-VICTIM SENSITIVITY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-17 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0910 |
2018-08-17 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-08-17 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 051-000-000 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-27 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2605 | 2605-98 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 705 | 10.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |