IL HB5202 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governor's Office of Management and Budget Act. Creates the Youth Budget Commission is established within the Office with the goal of producing an annual youth budget fiscal scan. Sets forth the membership and terms of the Commission. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOMB-BUDGET COMMISSION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-01HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030059.10New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback