IL HB5202 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-5)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-15 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Governor's Office of Management and Budget Act. Creates the Youth Budget Commission is established within the Office with the goal of producing an annual youth budget fiscal scan. Sets forth the membership and terms of the Commission. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

GOMB-BUDGET COMMISSION

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-15HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-28SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-23SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kwame Raoul
2018-05-18HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-000-000
2018-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2018-05-16SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Karen McConnaughay
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-05-02SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 107-000-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 005-000-000
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-17HouseFiscal Note Filed
2018-04-16HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-12HouseDo Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 006-001-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to State Government Administration Committee
2018-03-16HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-03-02HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-01HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski
2018-03-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-02-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2030059.10New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback