IL HB5201 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 31 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Creates a mechanics lien demand and referral pilot program. Provides that in counties with a code hearing unit, a recorder may adopt rules establishing a mechanics lien demand and referral process for residential property after a public hearing. Provides that if a recorder determines that a mechanics lien recorded in the grantor's index or the grantee's index is a defective lien, the recorder shall serve a Notice of Defective Lien by certified mail to the last known address of the owner. Provides that if the owner or legal representative of the owner of the residential property confirms in writing that the lien is not involved in pending litigation, the owner may request that the recorder refer the defective mechanics lien to the county's code hearing department for adjudication or serve a Demand to Commence Suit forcing the lienholder to either file suit, respond to the Demand, or forfeit the lien. Provides how the recorder is to serve a Demand to Commence Suit or file a Notice of Referral with the code hearing unit. Provides that if the mechanics lien is referred to the code hearing unit, the code hearing unit will set a hearing and notify the applicable parties. Provides if the recorder shows by clear and convincing evidence that the lien in question is a defective lien, the administrative law judge shall rule the lien is forfeited and that the lien no longer affects the chain of title of the property in any way. Limits liability. Includes other provisions. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2022. Further amends the Counties Code making conforming changes in county code hearing unit provisions. Amends the Mechanics Lien Act making conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MECHANICS LIEN DEMAND & REFER

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 69 N: 27 NV: 12 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 37 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 069-027-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 069-027-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-31HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-30HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-05-30HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2018-05-30HouseArrived in House
2018-05-30SenateThird Reading - Passed; 037-019-000
2018-05-29SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2018
2018-05-29SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Castro
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 008-004-000
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-22SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 23, 2018
2018-05-22SenateDo Pass as Amended Judiciary; 011-000-000
2018-05-22SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-05-21SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary
2018-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-17SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-16SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-05-11SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-09SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 23, 2018
2018-04-19SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-18HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-18HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-18HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-10HouseReported Back To Judiciary - Civil Committee;
2018-04-10HouseRecommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Civil Committee; 005-000-000
2018-03-21HouseTo Commercial Law Subcommittee
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5553-5010.8New CodeSee Bill Text
5555-41065New CodeSee Bill Text
5555-43043New CodeSee Bill Text
7706034Amended CodeCitation Text
7706034.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5201&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5201.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5201eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5201enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5201sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5201sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5201_04182018_015000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5201_05302018_007000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5201sam002_05312018_095001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5201sam001_05312018_095000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback