IL HB5200 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services to establish a Youth Training in the Construction Trades Program to award grants to community-based organizations for the purpose of establishing training programs for youth with an interest in the construction trades, electrical trade, or plumbing trade. Provides that under the training programs, youth shall receive formal training and education in the fundamentals and core competencies in their chosen trade and shall receive hands-on experience to further develop their skills by participating in community improvement projects involving the rehabilitation of vacant and abandoned residential housing in economically depressed areas of the State. Requires selected organizations to also use the grant money to establish an entrepreneurship program to provide youth with the capital and business management skills necessary to successfully launch their own business in their particular trade. Contains provisions concerning selection criteria and the Youth Training in the Construction Trades Fund. Amends the Illinois Housing Development Act. Requires the Illinois Housing Development Authority to establish a Training Youth in the Construction Trades Program that is substantially similar to the Youth Training in the Construction Trades Program. Contains provisions on selection criteria and the Training Youth in the Construction Trades Fund. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Youth Training and Education in the Construction Trades Program Fund and the Training Youth in the Construction Trades Fund. Effective July 1, 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DHS-IHDA-YOUTH-TRADE PROGRAMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-04-18HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20130510-48New CodeSee Bill Text
2038057.32New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.886New CodeSee Bill Text
301055.887New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback