IL HB5196 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Deposit of State Moneys Act. Provides that the State Treasurer may allow an eligible financial institution (rather than a bank or savings and loan association) to become a State depository. Provides that State depositories may submit proposals or applications that may be approved or rejected by the State Treasurer. Provides that the State Treasurer may accept a proposal from an eligible financial institution which provides for a reduced rate of interest provided that the financial institution documents the use of deposited funds for specified economic development projects (currently, economic community development projects). Modifies provisions concerning proposals from an eligible financial institution that provides for interest earnings on deposits of State moneys to be held by the financial institution in a separate account that the State Treasurer may use to secure up to 10% of any specified home loan to Illinois citizens. Removes provisions concerning proposals for a reduced rate of interest with moneys to be expended for specified purposes. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE MONEY-LINKED DEPOSIT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-03-03 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-14 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lance Yednock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 520 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |