IL HB5196 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Educator Licensure Article of the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2018, a licensee who holds a paraprofessional educator endorsement on an Educator License with Stipulations is not required to pay a license renewal fee. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-PARAPROFESSIONAL-FEE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-18SenateThird Reading - Passed; 043-000-000
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 009-000-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-001-000
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 007-001-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 005-004-000
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105521B-40Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback