IL HB5195 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-14 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Transportation Article of the School Code. Provides that each school board may provide free transportation for any pupil residing within 1 1/2 miles from the school attended where conditions are such that walking, either to or from the school to which a pupil is assigned for attendance or to or from a pick-up point or bus stop, constitutes a serious hazard to the safety of the pupil due to a course or pattern of criminal activity, as defined in the Illinois Streetgang Terrorism Omnibus Prevention Act. Provides for the adoption of guidelines by the local law enforcement agency as to what constitutes a serious safety hazard due to a course or pattern of criminal activity. Provides that the State Board of Education, in consultation with the local law enforcement agency, shall review the findings of the school board concerning a course or pattern of criminal activity and shall approve or disapprove the school board's determination that a serious safety hazard exists within 30 days after the school board submits its findings to the State Board. Authorizes the local law enforcement agency to determine what constitutes a course or pattern of criminal activity. Makes related changes. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act do not apply to the Chicago school district. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TRANSPORTATION-HAZARD

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 82 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-11-14HouseOverride Amendatory Veto - House Passed 082-023-000
2018-11-14House3/5 Vote Required
2018-11-14HouseMotion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-11-13HousePlaced on Calendar Amendatory Veto
2018-08-21HouseGovernor Amendatory Veto
2018-06-22HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-24HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 041-013-000
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2018-05-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018
2018-05-15SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 008-002-000
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to Education
2018-04-25SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-25SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-25SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2018-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018
2018-04-24SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-04-24HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-24HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-007-001
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-001-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105529-3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback