IL HB5195 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on November 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-11-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1142
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Transportation Article of the School Code. Provides that each school board may provide free transportation for any pupil residing within 1 1/2 miles from the school attended where conditions are such that walking, either to or from the school to which a pupil is assigned for attendance or to or from a pick-up point or bus stop, constitutes a serious hazard to the safety of the pupil due to a course or pattern of criminal activity, as defined in the Illinois Streetgang Terrorism Omnibus Prevention Act. Provides for the adoption of guidelines by the local law enforcement agency as to what constitutes a serious safety hazard due to a course or pattern of criminal activity. Provides that the State Board of Education, in consultation with the local law enforcement agency, shall review the findings of the school board concerning a course or pattern of criminal activity and shall approve or disapprove the school board's determination that a serious safety hazard exists within 30 days after the school board submits its findings to the State Board. Authorizes the local law enforcement agency to determine what constitutes a course or pattern of criminal activity. Makes related changes. Provides that the changes made by the amendatory Act do not apply to the Chicago school district. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-TRANSPORTATION-HAZARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-11-28 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 82 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-14 - House - Motion in House (Y: 82 N: 23 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 41 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 97 N: 7 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-11-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1142 |
2018-11-30 | House | Effective Date November 28, 2018 |
2018-11-28 | House | Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 041-011-000 |
2018-11-28 | Senate | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-11-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto November 27, 2018 |
2018-11-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-11-14 | House | Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 082-023-000 |
2018-11-14 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2018-11-14 | House | Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-11-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Amendatory Veto |
2018-06-22 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-24 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 041-013-000 |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 008-002-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 25, 2018 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-04-24 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-04-24 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 097-007-001 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 016-001-000 |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 29-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |