IL HB5193 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0971
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0971
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Course of Study Article of the School Code. Provides that the safety education that school boards and other boards may provide instruction in includes safe gun storage.
Title
SCH CD-GUN SAFETY INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0971 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2023 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-06 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Adriane Johnson |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 7, 2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 014-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Angelica Guerrero-Cuellar |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-005-000 |
2022-03-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 022-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
2022-02-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 013-008-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maura Hirschauer |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-20.83 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.78 | New Code | See Bill Text |