IL HB5191 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Repeals provisions concerning various special funds. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-SPECIAL FUNDS REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |