IL HB5190 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that the Illinois State Toll Highway Authority shall engage an outside consulting firm to conduct a feasibility study on tolling the portion of Interstate 80 located in this State. Provides that the feasibility study shall consider various factors. Provides that a written report on the feasibility study shall be delivered before December 1, 2018 to the General Assembly. Provides that if the General Assembly, after review of the feasibility study, determines that tolling is the best means of achieving major interstate system improvements in this State, the General Assembly shall create a strategic plan for tolling the portion of Interstate 80 located in this State and submit the strategic plan to the Governor's Office of Management and Budget before December 1, 2019. Repeals provisions on January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TOLL HIGHWAY ACT-I-80 TOLLWAY

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-13HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-27HouseAssigned to Tollway Oversight Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
605109.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback