IL HB5188 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-10 - Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Hall
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Repeals provisions concerning the School District Emergency Financial Assistance Fund, audit adjustments to State aid claims for alternative education programs, the Giant Steps Autism Center for Excellence pilot program, job training programs, posting of entrepreneurial skills teaching resources, posting of high-skilled manufacturing teaching resources, fast growth grants, the Alternative Route to Administrative Certification for National Board Certified Teachers, and the board of examiners. Makes conforming changes in the School Code and the Illinois Educational Labor Relations Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-REPEALS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Hall |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-006-000 |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2023-01-05 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-21.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 18-8.10 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1B-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1F-25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1F-62 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 1F-90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.123 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.128 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.146 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.171 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.172 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 2-3.33a | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 21-5e | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-83 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
115 | 5 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |