IL HB5187 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Emergency Medical Services (EMS) Systems Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall allow for an alternative rural staffing model for vehicle service providers that serve a rural or semi-rural population of 10,000 or fewer inhabitants and exclusively use volunteers, paid-on-call, or part-time employees, or a combination thereof (now, the use of part-time employees is not an option). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMS-RURAL STAFFING-PART-TIME

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-04-05HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to Public Health Committee
2024-02-09HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-02-09HouseFirst Reading
2024-02-08HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Christopher "C.D." Davidsmeyer

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
210503.85Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback