IL HB5187 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Employee Washroom Act, the Work Under Compressed Air Act, the Underground Sewer Employee Safety Act, and the Toxic Substances Disclosure to Employees Act. Provides that those Acts are inoperative until and unless certain federal occupational safety and health standards cease to be in effect.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-REPEAL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-04 - House - Motion in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Tabled By Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2022 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Chapin Rose |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 8, 2022 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-04 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 104-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000 |
2022-02-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 230 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
820 | 235 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
820 | 245 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
820 | 250 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
820 | 255 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |