IL HB5183 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Chicago Firefighter Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Beginning January 1, 2019, increases the amount of the minimum retirement annuity for certain firemen and the minimum widow's annuity to 150% (instead of 125%) of the federal poverty level. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-CHI FIRE-MINIMUM ANNUITY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Consideration Postponed |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 009-003-000 |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-004-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-19 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-04-17 | House | Pension Note Filed |
2018-04-17 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2018-04-16 | House | Pension Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Standard Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Standard Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 008-006-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-16 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 6-128.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 6-128.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |