IL HB5180 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery to deposit any estimated remaining proceeds from the prior fiscal year (rather than any remaining proceeds) after certain payments and transfers are made, into the Capital Projects Fund, on or before September 30 of each fiscal year (rather than on the last day of each fiscal year). Provides that, beginning in fiscal year 2019, the amount deposited shall be increased or decreased each year by the amount the estimated payment differs from the amount determined from each year-end financial audit. Provides that only remaining net deficits from prior fiscal years may reduce the requirement to deposit the funds, as determined by the annual financial audit. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-CAPITAL PROJECTS FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
2018-05-31SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
2018-05-30SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-29SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-29SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Terry Link
2018-05-25SenateRule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018
2018-05-17SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-19HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
2018-04-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-11HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016059.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback