IL HB5175 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Code. Provides that, beginning July 1, 2019, in fixing the salaries of teachers, a school board shall pay those who serve on a full-time basis a rate not less than $40,000 per year. Removes a provision providing for a periodic teacher salary increase schedule. Makes conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH CD-TEACHER SALARY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 64 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 14 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 10 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24HouseGovernor Vetoed
2018-06-29HouseSent to the Governor
2018-05-31HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-31HouseHouse Concurs
2018-05-31HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 064-040-000
2018-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2018-05-24HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-05-24HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2018-05-24HouseArrived in House
2018-05-24SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-05-24SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-014-001
2018-05-24SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2018-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Cunningham
2018-05-24SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2018-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-003-000
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-22SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Education; 008-002-000
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Education
2018-05-01SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2018-04-26HouseVerified
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 061-038-001
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2018-04-26HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-26HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 006-003-000
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-24HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight; 009-000-000
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Licensing, Administration & Oversight
2018-02-28HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-02-16HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-16HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-15HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105524-8Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=5175&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5175.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5175eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5175enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5175gms.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5175ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5175ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB5175sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5175_04262018_040000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/senate/10000HB5175_05242018_046000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/100/house/10000HB5175sam001_05312018_076000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback